VA HB1725 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Solar Energy Development Authority. Creates the Virginia Solar Energy Development Authority to facilitate, coordinate, and support the development of the solar energy industry and solar-powered electric energy facilities in the Commonwealth. The Authority is directed to do so by developing programs to increase the availability of financing for solar energy projects, facilitate the increase of solar energy generation systems on public and private sector facilities in the Commonwealth, promote the growth of the Virginia solar industry, and provide a hub for collaboration between entities to partner on solar energy projects. The Authority will be composed of 11 members appointed by the Governor. Members may be representatives of solar businesses, solar customers, renewable energy financiers, state and local government solar customers, and solar research academics. The Authority is charged with, among other tasks, (i) identifying existing state and regulatory or administrative barriers to the development of the solar energy industry, (ii) collaborating with entities such as higher education institutions to increase the training and development of the workforce needed by the solar industry in Virginia, including industry-recognized credentials and certifications, (iii) applying to the U.S. Department of Energy for loan guarantees for such projects, and (iv) performing any other activities as may seem appropriate to increase solar energy generation in Virginia and the associated jobs and economic development and competitiveness benefits. At the recommendation of the Authority, the Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy may utilize nonstate-funded support to carry out any duties assigned to the Director. Funding for nonstate support may be provided by any source, public or private, for the purposes for which the Authority is created.
Title
Virginia Solar Energy Development Authority; created, report.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103207D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1725 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1725+hil |