VA HB1722 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Remote sales and use tax collection; sufficient activity by dealers and marketplace facilitators as to require registration for sales and use tax collection. Directs the Department of Taxation (the Department) to require a remote seller to collect sales and use tax if the seller has more than $100,000 in annual gross revenue from sales in Virginia or at least 200 sales transactions in Virginia and requires a marketplace facilitator, which enables marketplace sellers to sell in Virginia through its marketplace, to collect sales and use tax if its annual gross revenue from facilitated sales in Virginia exceeds $100,000 or it facilitates at least 200 sales transactions in Virginia. The bill provides that the obligation of remote sellers and marketplace facilitators to collect sales and use tax shall not apply to transactions occurring before July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote sales & use tax collection; sufficient activity by dealers & marketplace facilitators, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 72 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 20-N 2-A) (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1722ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 17-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106667D-S1 (72-Y 17-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N)
2019-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1722S1
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106667D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106667D-S1
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 20-N 2-A)
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (72-Y 20-N 2-A)
2019-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1722H1
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105919D-H1
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105919D-H1
2019-01-28HouseReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 4-N)
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-23HouseReferred from Rules by voice vote
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-12-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102020D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581601(n/a)See Bill Text
581602(n/a)See Bill Text
581604(n/a)See Bill Text
581605(n/a)See Bill Text
581606(n/a)See Bill Text
581612(n/a)See Bill Text
581612.1(n/a)See Bill Text
581615(n/a)See Bill Text
581625(n/a)See Bill Text
581635(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1722
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1722+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1722H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1722S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1722ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0054+HB1722
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2121+HB1722
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0307+HB1722
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1722+HB1722
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0549HB1722+HB1722
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2800+HB1722

Bill Comments

feedback