VA HB172 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Solar projects and energy storage projects; siting agreements with host localities. Permits a host locality in which an applicant is seeking to install a solar project or energy storage project to establish certain requirements in the siting agreement to restrict the visibility of the solar project or energy storage project from public secondary roads in order to maintain the view of the surrounding community.
Title
Solar projects and energy storage projects; siting agreements with host localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100722D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2316.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2316.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |