VA HB1718 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (10-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; fuel cost recovery. Requires an electric utility, as a condition of approval of any request by an electric utility for recovery through its fuel factor of costs incurred under a natural gas capacity contract not previously subject to review in a fuel factor case, to prove by a preponderance of the evidence that, at the time the contract giving rise to the costs for which recovery is sought was executed, the utility had (i) identified and determined the date and amount of new fueling resource it needed; (ii) objectively studied all available alternative fueling resource options, including options other than new capacity contract or contracts to meet the identified and determined need; and (iii) concluded on the basis of such identifications, determinations, and studies that the pipeline capacity contract or contracts were the lowest-cost available option, taking into consideration fixed and variable costs and a reasonable projection of utilization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; fuel cost recovery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 8-N) (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenatePassed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (10-Y 3-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N 1-A)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 40-N 1-A)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 8-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-17HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-17HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102941D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback