VA HB1718 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Commercial Code; negotiable instruments and bank deposits and collections. Updates Articles 3 (Negotiable Instruments) and 4 (Bank Deposits and Collections) of the UCC to reflect court decisions and advances in technology. The amendments cover the following topics: payment and discharge, telephonically generated checks, electronic communications, and consumer notices. The amendments to Articles 3 and 4 were completed by the Uniform Law Commissioners, in conjunction with the American Law Institute, in 2002 and have been enacted in 10 states.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code; negotiable instruments and bank deposits and collections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Senate: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Engrossed bill reprinted 11104774D-EH1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11100653D-E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1718EH1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Amendment by Delegate Merricks agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104774D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104774D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Rereferred to Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-24 | House: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to | |
2011-01-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100653D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 4 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 4 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 4 | 207.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 4 | 207.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 4 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 4 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 4 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |