VA HB1717 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary school teachers; certain training activities; frequency; report. Prohibits any public elementary or secondary school teacher from being required to participate more frequently than once every five years in any training relating to the etiology, prevention, transmission modes, and effects of blood-borne pathogens; treating students with seizures and seizure disorders, including information about seizure recognition and related first aid; the appropriate management of student conduct and student offenses in violation of school board policies; or secure mandatory test violations. The bill requires each such teacher who completes any such training to sign a written attestation that the teacher has been trained in and understands the relevant subject matter. The bill requires each local school board to report to the Board of Education and the General Assembly no later than October 1, 2023, on the frequency with which each public elementary and secondary school teacher in the local school division participates in each required training or professional development activity.
Title
Public elementary and secondary school teachers; frequency of certain training activities, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101682D |
Subjects
Education
Elementary Schools
Public Schools
Secondary Schools
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Teachers
Elementary Schools
Public Schools
Secondary Schools
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Teachers