VA HB1716 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Conformity of the Commonwealth's taxation system with the Internal Revenue Code; net interest deduction. Conforms the taxation system in Virginia with relevant provisions of the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
Commonwealth's taxation system; conformity with the Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106745D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20106047D |