VA HB1712 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0472)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Damaging or removing temporary work signs; penalty. Expands the prohibition on damaging or removing traffic control devices or street signs, punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor, to include damaging or removing temporary signs approved by the Department of Transportation warning motorists that work is in progress on or adjacent to the highway or that certain vehicles may be entering the highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary work signs; damaging or removing, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0472)
2023-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 472 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-21SenateSigned by President
2023-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1712ER)
2023-02-20HouseEnrolled
2023-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14SenateRead third time
2023-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-09SenateReported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2023-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-30HouseRead first time
2023-01-26HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-16HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding
2023-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101688D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462832(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1712
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1712+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1712ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0472+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1712F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1712FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1902V0009+HB1712
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H19V0051+HB1712
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1261+HB1712
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S11V0071+HB1712
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0439HB1712+HB1712
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0445HB1712+HB1712

Bill Comments

feedback