VA HB1710 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicle registration fees; Public Safety Trust Vehicle registration fees; Public Safety Trust Fund. Imposes an additional vehicle registration fee to be deposited into the Public Safety Trust Fund, established by the bill. The additional registration fee would be $1.25 per year beginning July 1, 2020, and would be increased over a period of 10 years to $12.50 per year. The revenues in the Public Safety Trust Fund would be used to address staffing, retention, and pay suppression issues at the Department of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle registration fees; Public Safety Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-23HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 20106024D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462686(n/a)See Bill Text
462694(n/a)See Bill Text
462694.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback