VA HB171 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; extended time for new United States citizens to register. Allows a person who becomes a naturalized United States citizen after the close of registration records, and who is otherwise qualified to vote, to register to vote up to and including the day of the election. The bill requires the Department of Elections to prescribe procedures for the addition of persons registered under the provisions of the bill to the lists of registered voters.
Title
Voter registration; extended time for new United States citizens to register.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101172D |