VA HB1708 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Education; standards of accreditation; industry certification credentials obtained by high school students. Requires the Board of Education (the Board) to consider for inclusion in the student outcome measures included in the Standards of Accreditation the number of industry certification credentials, as defined by the Board, obtained by high school students. The bill requires the Board to report its conclusion to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by November 1, 2017. The bill prohibits the Board from including the number of such credentials in the student outcome measures included in the Standards of Accreditation prior to the 2018 Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Accreditation; industry certification credentials obtained by high school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05HouseCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
2017-04-05SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-04-05SenateChair votes Yes
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 20-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-16HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1708ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2017-02-10SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2017-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1708H1
2017-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104312D-H1
2017-02-01HouseRead second time
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104312D-H1
2017-01-30HouseReported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2017-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Innovation
2017-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102469D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1708
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1708+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1708H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1708ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0903V0012+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H09V0113+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1812+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0233+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0670HB1708+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0694HB1708+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0695HB1708+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0696HB1708+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2589+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2875+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1156HB1708+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1157HB1708+HB1708
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1158HB1708+HB1708

Bill Comments

feedback