VA HB1705 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Dulles Airport Access Road; high-occupancy vehicles. Permits a high-occupancy vehicle having two or more occupants to use the eastbound lanes of the Dulles Airport Access Road regardless of whether such vehicle is being used for airport-related purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dulles Airport Access Road; use of certain high-occupancy vehicles on the eastbound lanes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Transportation
2019-01-10HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-09HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-12HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-12-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101084D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332501(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback