VA HB1702 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Library of Virginia; disposition of official correspondence of the Governor. Requires the Library of Virginia to catalogue and make accessible to the public all correspondence and other records required to be delivered by an outgoing Governor within one year of the delivery of such correspondence and records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Library of Virginia; disposition of official correspondence of the Governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24HouseFailed to pass in House
2019-02-24HouseNo further action taken
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Suetterlein, Sturtevant, Ebbin
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Peace, Hayes
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-15SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (9-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-31HouseReported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2018-12-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-12-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100717D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22126(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1702
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1702+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0015+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0095+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0206V0021+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0060+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2348+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0117+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0336+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1702+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0713HB1702+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3041+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0844HB1702+HB1702

Bill Comments

feedback