VA HB1702 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Police; reporting hate crimes. Includes within the definition of "hate crime" a criminal act committed against a person because of sexual orientation or gender identification and requires the reporting of the commission of such crime to the State Police.
Title
Hate crimes; reporting to State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101555D |