VA HB1702 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transfer, etc., of firearms from licensed dealer; criminal history record information. Provides that a licensed firearms dealer may perform a criminal history record information check before selling, renting, trading, or transferring any firearm owned by the dealer that is not in his inventory. Current law requires that a dealer perform such a check only if the firearm is from the dealer's inventory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; transfer, etc., from licensed dealer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
2015-04-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 759 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-04-15HouseCommunicated to Governor
2015-04-15HouseSpeaker ruled Governor's recommendation not germane
2015-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-27HouseGovernor's substitute printed 15105774D-H1
2015-03-27HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2015-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-03-10HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
2015-03-07SenateSigned by President
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1702ER)
2015-03-06HouseEnrolled
2015-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2015-02-26SenateSenators: Garrett, Stanley, Edwards
2015-02-26SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2015-02-26HouseDelegates: DeSteph, Lingamfelter, Hope
2015-02-26HouseConferees appointed by House
2015-02-26HouseHouse acceded to request
2015-02-25SenateSenate requested conference committee
2015-02-25SenateSenate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2015-02-24HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N)
2015-02-24HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 94-N)
2015-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2015-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2015-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2015-02-20SenateRead third time
2015-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
2015-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance
2015-02-16SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2015-02-11SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-10HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-09HouseRead second time and engrossed
2015-02-07HouseRead first time
2015-02-06HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
2015-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2015-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2015-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-05HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
2015-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2015-01-20HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #1
2015-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2015-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100323D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1702
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1702+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1702ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1702H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0759+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H1501V0012+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H15V0019+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H0208V0007+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H02V0052+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2062+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S03V0230+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S05V0277+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0638HB1702+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0639HB1702+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0668HB1702+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2719+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0841HB1702+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2883+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0981HB1702+HB1702

Bill Comments

feedback