VA HB1702 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; vacancies in certain local offices; oaths. Provides that the failure by an elected local governing body member, mayor, or school board member to take the oath of office before attending his first meeting will not create a vacancy in the office so long as he takes the oath within 30 days after the first meeting. Under present law such vacancies must be filled by special elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; member of local office, elected school board, etc., to take oath before first meeting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
2011-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 78 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-25 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-25 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-25 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1702ER)
2011-02-25 House: Enrolled
2011-02-18 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-18 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-17 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2011-02-15 Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
2011-02-03 Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2011-02-03 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-02-02 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-02 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-01 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1702H1
2011-02-01 House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104363D-H1
2011-02-01 House: Read second time
2011-01-31 House: Read first time
2011-01-28 House: Committee substitute printed 11104363D-H1
2011-01-28 House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2011-01-25 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
2011-01-13 House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections
2011-01-10 House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2011-01-10 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100821D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242228(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1702
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1702+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1702H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1702ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0078+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H1802V0010+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H18V0019+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV0370+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S08V0081+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0498HB1702+HB1702
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0525HB1702+HB1702

Bill Comments

feedback