VA HB1701 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain private schools in the Commonwealth; disclosure of certain employee records for purpose of accreditation. Permits private elementary and secondary schools to disclose to the Virginia Council for Private Education criminal history record information received for current employees for the purpose of seeking or maintaining Council accreditation. Certain private schools in the Commonwealth; disclosure of certain employee records for purpose of accreditation. Permits private elementary and secondary schools to disclose to the Virginia Council for Private Education criminal history record information received for current employees for the purpose of seeking or maintaining Council accreditation.
Title
Private schools, certain; disclosure of certain employee records for purpose of accreditation.
Sponsors
Del. Mike Cherry [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1701ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1701H1 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104595D-H1 |
2023-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104595D-H1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100792D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 289.035 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |