VA HB1698 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Zoning Appeals; written order; certified mail. Authorizes a locality to send a zoning administrator's appeal order using certified mail. Current law allows such an order to be sent only by registered mail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning Appeals, Board of; written order, certified mail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1698ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-24HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-24HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-22HouseRead first time
2019-01-18HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2018-12-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102389D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522311(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1698
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1698+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1698ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0387+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0702V0005+HB1698
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0001+HB1698
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1809+HB1698
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1823+HB1698
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0076+HB1698
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1698+HB1698
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB1698+HB1698

Bill Comments

feedback