VA HB1698 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Student questionnaires and surveys; parental notification and consent. Requires each school board, prior to administering any questionnaire or survey requesting that students provide sexual information, mental health information, medical information, information on student health risk behaviors, other information on controlled substance use, or any other information that the school board deems to be sensitive in nature, to give the parent 30 days' written notice of the nature and types of questions, the purposes and age-appropriateness of the questionnaire or survey, how such information will be used, who will have access to such information, the steps that will be taken to protect student privacy, and whether and how any findings or results will be disclosed. In any case in which such a survey is requested by a state agency or is required by state law, the bill requires the relevant state agency to provide to the school board all information required to be included in the notice. The bill gives the parent the right to review the document in a manner mutually agreed upon by the school and parent and the right to exempt his child from participation. Under current law, (i) such written notice only applies to surveys or questionnaires on sexual information and information on student health risk behaviors, (ii) the detailed contents of the notice only apply to information on student health risk behaviors, and (iii) the manner of parental review of the document is unspecified.
Title
Students; questionnaires and surveys requesting sexual information, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 703 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1698ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15104519D-EH1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1698EH1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Amendments by Delegate Wilt agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104519D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104519D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100565D |