VA HB1698 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0270)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0270)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Clintwood. Updates the boundary description in the charter of the Town of Clintwood. Other changes include removing or updating references to outdated town officers, removing outdated provisions related to the mayor's powers, revising council salary provisions, and removing and updating outdated town powers.
Title
Charter; Town of Clintwood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0270) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 270 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1698ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101442D |