VA HB1698 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sexually violent predators. Expands a procedure for rescission of a sexually violent predator's refusal to participate with a mental health examination to allow him to rescind a refusal to participate and provides that assessment hearings may be done by videoconference.
Title
Sexually violent predators; procedure for rescission of respondent's refusal to take examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 448 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1698ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1698H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104773D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104773D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102429D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1275 (Same As) 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |