VA HB1696 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1696
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia's Region 2000 Airport Authority. Authorizes the City of Lynchburg, acting alone or with one or more of the Counties of Amherst, Appomattox, Bedford, or Campbell to create an airport authority pursuant to the 2007 Virginia's Region 2000 Airport Authority Act. Current law would only allow the creation of a Virginia's Region 2000 Airport Authority (the Authority) if Lynchburg and one of the above-mentioned counties participated. The bill would also give the Authority the power to use its facilities for any governmental use approved by the Board of Directors of the Authority. The bill contains technical changes.
Title
Virginia's Region 2000 Airport Authority; authorizes City of Lynchburg to create, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-07 | House | Continued to 2021 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104579D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1696 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote