VA HB1696 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Filling vacancies in the United States Senate. Removes the language limiting the date at which a special election can be held to fill a vacancy occurring in the representation of the Commonwealth in the United States Senate. The bill also removes the authority of the Governor to make a temporary appointment to fill such a vacancy. The bill allows the Governor to immediately issue a writ to call an election upon receipt of written notification by a Senator or Senator-elect of his resignation and makes such resignation irrevocable after the date stated by him for his resignation or after the forty-fifth day before the date set for the special election.
Title
Filling vacancies in the United States Senate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101077D |