VA HB1696 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers. Places limitations and conditions on the relationship between motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers. This bill is the same as
Title
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers; places limitations and conditions on relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 774 (effective 4/6/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1696ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1696ER) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1696H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104506D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104506D-H1 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103121D |