VA HB1695 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Passing a stopped school bus; civil penalty. Increases from $250 to $500 the civil penalty for passing a stopped school bus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Passing a stopped school bus; civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-17HouseReferred from Transportation by voice vote
2018-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-12-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101584D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462844(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback