VA HB1695 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Crossing bridge or culvert by vehicle heavier than allowed. Allows a vehicle whose gross weight exceeds the posted carrying capacity for a bridge or culvert to cross such bridge or culvert if (i) no more than one axle combination is on such bridge or culvert at the same time and (ii) the weight on one axle combination does not exceed the carrying capacity for such bridge or culvert.
Title
Crossing bridge or culvert by vehicle heavier than allowed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100992D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1695 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1695+hil |