VA HB1692 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund; Virginia Tobacco Region Revolving Fund; eligible localities; City of Petersburg. Adds the City of Petersburg to a group of localities that is eligible to receive funds from the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund and the Virginia Tobacco Region Revolving Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco Indemnification & Community Revitalization & Va Tobacco Region Revolving Funds; eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N)
2023-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2023-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101681D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323108(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback