VA HB1692 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Medical assistance; determination of income; personal needs allowance. Provides that, when determining the income of a recipient of medical assistance services who is receiving long-term care in a medical institution or intermediate care facility, the Department of Medical Assistance Services shall disregard a personal needs allowance in an amount that is at least $150 and that the amount of the personal needs allowance shall be adjusted annually to reflect changes in the Consumer Price Index, all urban consumers (CPI-U).
Title
Medical assistance services; determination of income, personal needs allowance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-12-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100943D |