VA HB1692 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (10-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (10-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Four-year public institutions of higher education; alternative tuition or fee structures. Permits each public institution of higher education to offer alternative tuition or fee structures to students. The bill provides that if a public institution of higher education, with the approval of the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia (the Council), offers alternative tuition or fee structures, including discounted tuition, four-year flat tuition rates, discounted student fees, or student fee and student services flexibility, to any Virginia-domiciled, first-time, incoming freshman undergraduate student who enrolls full time with the intent to earn a degree in a program that leads to employment in a high-demand field in the region, according to guidelines established by the Council, each student who receives the benefits of such an alternative tuition or fee structure shall count one and a half times for the purpose of (i) targeted economic and innovation incentives pursuant to subdivision 3 of § 23-38.87:16, (ii) the base adequacy funding guidelines adopted and periodically updated by the Joint Subcommittee Studying Higher Education Funding Policies, or (iii) biennial assessments of institutional performance as set forth in Part 4 of the general appropriation act and consistent with § 23-9.6:1.01.
Title
Higher educational institutions; alternative tuition or fee structures offered to students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (10-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1692H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104491D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104491D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101165D |