VA HB1689 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Parole; exception to limitation on the application of parole statutes. Provides that a person is entitled to parole if (i) such person was sentenced by a jury prior to the date of the Supreme Court of Virginia decision in Fishback v. Commonwealth, 260 Va. 104 (June 9, 2000), in which the Court held that a jury should be instructed on the fact that parole has been abolished, for a noncapital felony committed on or after the abolition of parole going into effect (on January 1, 1995) and (ii) the jury was not instructed on the abolition of parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole; exception to limitation on the application of parole statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101978D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531165.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback