VA HB1688 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cemeteries; grass cutting. Exempts land used for the interment of human remains owned by an individual, family, property owners' association, or church from a local ordinance requiring certain owners of property to cut the grass, weeds, and other foreign growth on such property.
Title
Cemeteries; grass cutting on land used for interment of human remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 597 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1688ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20107083D-EH1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1688EH1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Amendment by Delegate McQuinn agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107083D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107083D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105731D |