VA HB1688 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Disorderly conduct; students. Provides that a student at any elementary or secondary school shall not be guilty of disorderly conduct in public places if the disorderly conduct occurred on school property or a school bus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elementary school, etc.; students not guilty of disorderly conduct, school property or school bus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100704D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182415(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback