VA HB1688 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
House of Delegates Districts; technical adjustment. Changes district assignments of certain census blocks between Districts 10 and 33 in Clarke County in order to reflect a new precinct line. District 10 will have a deviation of 1.1 percent from the ideal district population.
Title
House of Delegates Districts; technical adjustments in Clarke County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102124D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1688 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1688+hil |