VA HB1687 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1687
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund and Grant Program; firearm and ammunition tax. Establishes the Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund (the Fund), to be administered by the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department), to distribute grants to localities and organizations for the purpose of improving public health and safety by supporting effective violence reduction initiatives in communities that are disproportionately impacted by violence, particularly homicides, shootings, and aggravated assaults. Funds may also be used to finance the hiring of counselors in public elementary and secondary schools and research initiatives that have the objective of reducing gun violence. The bill provides that the Department shall issue grants on a competitive basis. As a condition of receiving a grant, a locality or organization must commit a cash or in-kind contribution equivalent to the amount of the grant, with waivers allowed for good cause, and report on its progress toward achieving the grant's objectives. The bill requires the Department to provide public access to such reports. The bill imposes a 15 percent tax on the sale of any firearm or ammunition, with all revenue from the tax accruing to the Fund. Sales to state or local agencies or law-enforcement officers are exempt from the tax.
Title
Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund and Grant Program; established.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20100209D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1687 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 663 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 104.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1687 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1687+hil |