VA HB1685 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Short-term rentals. Provides that no locality shall require a person to register a short-term rental pursuant to the locality's land use and zoning authority if the person meets certain criteria set out in the bill.
Title
Short-term rentals; no locality shall require a person to register, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105804D |