VA HB1685 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; enrolled students; disorderly conduct. Provides that no enrolled public school student who disrupts the operation of the school at which he is enrolled or any activity conducted or sponsored by the school at which he is enrolled on school grounds during normal school hours is guilty of disorderly conduct.
Title
Public schools; enrolled students, disorderly conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100685D |