VA HB1685 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase of handguns; limitation on handgun purchases; penalty. Prohibits any person who is not a licensed firearms dealer from purchasing more than one handgun in a 30-day period and establishes such an offense as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts from this provision (i) persons who have been issued a certificate by the Department of State Police under certain circumstances and with an enhanced background check, (ii) law-enforcement agencies and officers, (iii) state and local correctional facilities, (iv) licensed private security companies, (v) persons who hold a valid Virginia concealed handgun permit, (vi) persons whose handgun has been stolen or irretrievably lost or who are trading in a handgun, (vii) purchases of handguns in a private sale, and (viii) purchases of antique firearms.
Title
Handguns; limitation on purchases, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Daun Hester [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2017-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101004D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1685 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1685+hil |