VA HB1684 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Worker misclassification; debarment procedures. Revises the procedure under which a contractor may be debarred from public contracts for misclassification of workers. The bill requires the Department of Taxation to notify an employer of a determination that the employer failed to properly classify an individual and allows the employer to apply for judicial or administrative review. Upon a subsequent violation, and once the opportunity for appeals has been exhausted, the Department is required to provide notice to all public bodies that they shall not award a contract to firms associated with the offending employer for specified periods. Under current law, notice to all public bodies is required after the first violation determined by the Department, and debarment is required without reference to the timing of appeals.
Title
Worker misclassification; debarment procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1684ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100974D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1354 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
SB1354 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
SB1354 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)