VA HB168 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]


Class size limits; grades six through 12; science laboratory classes. Establishes a maximum class size of 24 students in science laboratory classes in grades six through 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Class size limits; establishes maximum of 24 students in science laboratory classes in grades 6-12.


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-02-13HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2018-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-05HouseReported from Education with amendment (12-Y 10-N)
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-22HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-12-22HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102514D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments