VA HB1679 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Business licenses; acceptable identification. Provides that for any application for a business license issued by a locality under its business, professional, and occupational license taxing authority, the locality shall not require an applicant to provide a social security number if the applicant provides his federal employer identification number instead. Further, if a valid federal employer identification number is provided, the locality shall not be required to determine the residency status of the applicant.
Title
Business licenses; acceptable identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 258 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1679ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 20104385D-E |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1679E |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104385D |