VA HB1678 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charter; Town of White Stone. Updates the charter for the Town of White Stone in Lancaster County to reflect the shift from May to November municipal elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

White Stone, Town of; amending charter, municipal elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)
2023-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 71 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
2023-03-08SenateSigned by President
2023-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1678ER)
2023-03-07HouseEnrolled
2023-02-22SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-22SenateRead third time
2023-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-20SenateReported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2023-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-24HouseRead first time
2023-01-20HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2023-01-11HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2023-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100443D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback