VA HB1678 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Election day; extending polling hours. Extends from 7:00 p.m. to 8:00 p.m. the time at which polls close on election day. The bill aligns candidate filing deadlines and party nomination deadlines with the closing of polls. The bill provides that these changes will not become effective unless reenacted by the 2021 Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election day; extending polling hours from 7:00 p.m. to 8:00 p.m.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1678ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate (20-Y 17-N)
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 4-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (65-Y 35-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1678H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107627D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates HB1643 (Ayala)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107627D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2020-01-21HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 20102034D

Same As/Similar To

HB1643 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242503(n/a)See Bill Text
242507(n/a)See Bill Text
242510(n/a)See Bill Text
242603(n/a)See Bill Text
242700(n/a)See Bill Text
242701(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback