VA HB1677 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retail sales and use tax; service exemptions; Retail sales and use tax; service exemptions; diagnostic work for automotive repair and emergency roadside service. Exempts any amount charged for labor for diagnostic work for automotive repair and emergency roadside service for motor vehicles from retail sales and use tax, regardless of whether there is a sale of a repair or replacement part or a shop supply charge.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; diagnostic work for automotive repair and emergency roadside service.
Sponsors
Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035) | |
2023-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 35 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1677ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 23101072D-E |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1677E |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101072D |