VA HB1674 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1674
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Area; provisional surface water withdrawal permit. Authorizes the State Water Control Board to issue a provisional surface water withdrawal permit within the Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Area to an applicant that has not identified an end user for the water. Such permit shall not allow the withdrawal of water until an end user has been identified and the permittee has provided a report containing information on the need for and proposed use of the surface water, a description of the raw water intake, and other information. The bill provides that once the Department of Environmental Quality approves the report, the permittee shall request a permit modification. Finally, the bill provides that no potential withdrawal amount of any provisional permit shall be used in the calculation of available water when assessing a subsequent surface water withdrawal application in the affected stream reach if the provisional permit has not been modified to reflect an end user, the Department and the subsequent applicant have found the provisional withdrawal to be inappropriate, and the provisional permit holder has failed to state that an end user will be secured within 12 months. Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Area; provisional surface water withdrawal permit. Authorizes the State Water Control Board to issue a provisional surface water withdrawal permit within the Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Area to an applicant that has not identified an end user for the water. Such permit shall not allow the withdrawal of water until an end user has been identified and the permittee has provided a report containing information on the need for and proposed use of the surface water, a description of the raw water intake, and other information. The bill provides that once the Department of Environmental Quality approves the report, the permittee shall request a permit modification. Finally, the bill provides that no potential withdrawal amount of any provisional permit shall be used in the calculation of available water when assessing a subsequent surface water withdrawal application in the affected stream reach if the provisional permit has not been modified to reflect an end user, the Department and the subsequent applicant have found the provisional withdrawal to be inappropriate, and the provisional permit holder has failed to state that an end user will be secured within 12 months.
Title
Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Area; provisional surface water withdrawal permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20109068D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1674H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106885D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106885D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104857D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1674 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:22.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |