VA HB1674 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School accreditation frequency. Provides that the Board of Education may review the accreditation status of a public school once every three years if the school has been fully accredited for three consecutive years. At the end of the three-year period, the Board shall review the accreditation status of the school and may accredit the school for another three years if the school met accreditation requirements for all three years. The bill requires the Board to review the accreditation status of any school that (i) would have failed to achieve full accreditation in one of the years of the three-year period or (ii) has had a significant boundary adjustment. The bill requires Standards of Learning assessment scores to continue to be reported on the School Performance Report Card annually, regardless of accreditation frequency.
Title
School accreditation; review of status by Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 566 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1674ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105669D-H2 |
2015-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Newman, Smith, Lucas |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Greason, LeMunyon, Bulova |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (36-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1674H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15103995D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-23 | House | Passed by until Thursday, January 29, 2015 |
2015-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103995D-H1 |
2015-01-21 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102637D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |