VA HB1672 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Resisting detention; penalty. Makes it a Class 3 misdemeanor for any person to intentionally prevent or attempt to prevent a law-enforcement officer from lawfully detaining him, defined in the bill as fleeing or attempting to flee from a law-enforcement officer when (i) the officer has reasonable articulable suspicion to detain the person, (ii) the officer communicates to the person an order to stop, and (iii) the person refuses to obey the order to stop. The bill allows a person charged with committing this offense to be arrested and immediately brought before a magistrate. The bill requires law enforcement to make a report to the Central Criminal Records Exchange when any person is arrested on such charge. Resisting detention; penalty. Makes it a Class 3 misdemeanor for any person to intentionally prevent or attempt to prevent a law-enforcement officer from lawfully detaining him, defined in the bill as fleeing or attempting to flee from a law-enforcement officer when (i) the officer has reasonable articulable suspicion to detain the person, (ii) the officer communicates to the person an order to stop, and (iii) the person refuses to obey the order to stop. The bill allows a person charged with committing this offense to be arrested and immediately brought before a magistrate. The bill requires law enforcement to make a report to the Central Criminal Records Exchange when any person is arrested on such charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resisting detention; Class 3 misdemeanor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-13SenatePassed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
2023-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2023-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-27HouseVOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N)
2023-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (50-Y 47-N)
2023-01-26HousePrinted as engrossed 23101786D-E
2023-01-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1672E
2023-01-26HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2023-01-26HouseRead second time
2023-01-25HouseRead first time
2023-01-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 9-N)
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
2023-01-13HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101786D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182460(n/a)See Bill Text
192390(n/a)See Bill Text
19274(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1672
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1672+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1672E+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104767A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB1672AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1672F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1672FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0801V0094+HB1672
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0801V0097+HB1672
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0033+HB1672
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0061+HB1672
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1150+HB1672
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0226+HB1672

Bill Comments

feedback