VA HB1670 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Affordable housing; City of Richmond. Adds the City of Richmond to the list of localities with authority to provide for an affordable housing dwelling unit program.
Title
Affordable housing; City of Richmond added to list with authority to provide dwelling unit program.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. David Toscano [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101221D |