VA HB1668 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Menhaden; total landings. Adjusts the annual total allowable landings for menhaden downward from 168,937.75 metric tons to 168,213.16 metric tons and provides that any portion of the coast-wide total allowable catch that is relinquished by a state that is a member of the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission (the Commission) shall be redistributed to Virginia and other states according to the Commission's allocation guidelines. The bill adjusts the annual harvest cap for the purse seine fishery for Atlantic menhaden in the Chesapeake Bay downward from 87,216 metric tons to 51,000 metric tons. The bill also removes a provision that applies the amount by which certain actual Chesapeake Bay harvests fall below the harvest cap as a credit to the following year.
Title
Menhaden; adjusts the annual total allowable landings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105611D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2 | 1000.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |