VA HB1667 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Local land use approvals; extension of approvals to address the COVID-19 pandemic. Extends from July 1, 2023, to July 1, 2025, the sunset date for various local land use approvals that were valid and outstanding as of July 1, 2020. The bill also provides that its provisions shall not be construed to extend previous extensions related to the housing crisis and that any extension of approvals outstanding as of July 1, 2020, shall apply to any such approvals granted subsequent to July 1, 2020 that expire prior to July 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local land use approvals; extension of approvals to address the COVID-19 pandemic, sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Counties, Cities and Towns
2023-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N)
2023-01-17HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2023-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104199D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522209.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback