VA HB1666 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

University of Virginia's College at Wise; reduced rate tuition. Permits the board of visitors of the University of Virginia to charge reduced rate tuition to any student enrolled at the University of Virginia's College at Wise who resides in the Appalachian Region as defined in relevant federal law, is domiciled in the Appalachian Region, and is entitled to in-state tuition charges at a public institution of higher education in the Appalachian Region provided such entitlement is based on circumstances that when applied to a student who resides in Virginia would result in entitlement to in-state tuition. The bill prohibits the board of visitors from setting such reduced rate below the in-state tuition rate for Virginia students attending the University of Virginia's College at Wise. The bill contains an emergency clause and is identical to SB 1519.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Virginia's College at Wise; reduced rate tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 225 (effective 3/5/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1666ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-12HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106442D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-08SenatePassed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-08SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1666S1
2019-02-08SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106442D-S1
2019-02-08SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-08SenateRead third time
2019-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106442D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-22HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-18HouseRead first time
2019-01-16HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2018-12-03HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-12-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19101361D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231507(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1666
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1666+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1666S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1666ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0225+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0206V0001+HB1666
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0002+HB1666
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1761+HB1666
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0284+HB1666
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0472HB1666+HB1666
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0484HB1666+HB1666
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2672+HB1666

Bill Comments

feedback